skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 18/06/2019 5:38:43 PM

Sungaila, Joseph

CPSO#: 15928

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 May 1996
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 31 May 1996

Summary

Date of Death: 14-Feb-2012

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German, Lithuanian

Education:University of Innsbruck, 1947

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 01 Jan 1958 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Sep 1956
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 May 1996