skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 18/07/2019 2:04:05 PM

Kady, Michel

CPSO#: 15717

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2006

Summary

Date of Death: 21-May-2011

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian

Education:University of Paris, 1954

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1956
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2002
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2002
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2006