skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 26/06/2019 10:17:43 AM

Luttor, Charles

CPSO#: 15606

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 06 Jul 1994
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Date of Death: 20-Oct-2007

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Medical University of Pecs, 1942

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 01 Jan 1955 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Apr 1956
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Jul 1994