skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 16/06/2019 7:19:25 AM

Walker, Benjamin Robertson

CPSO#: 15597

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 23 Jun 2000
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1955

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Apr 1956
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1998