skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 24/06/2019 9:49:03 AM

Gordon, Duncan Alexander

CPSO#: 15560

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 14 Jun 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 14 Jun 2012

Summary

Date of Death: 2-Dec-2012

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1955

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 1960 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 1956
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 14 Jun 2012