skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 25/05/2019 12:00:24 AM

Heringer, Thomas

CPSO#: 15550

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1999
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Date of Death: 16-Jul-2002

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1955

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Feb 1956
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1995