skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 18/06/2019 4:57:36 PM

Carmichael, John Alexander

CPSO#: 15376

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 24 Oct 1994
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 24 Oct 1994

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1953

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 10 Nov 1958 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 1955
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Sep 1959
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Sep 1966
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Oct 1994