skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 25/08/2019 12:16:26 PM

Nathan, Max Taylor

CPSO#: 15271

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 Jan 2005
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 04 Jan 2005

Summary

Date of Death: 2-Mar-2006

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1955

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Jan 1960 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 1955
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Jan 2005