skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 19/07/2019 7:36:26 PM

Ehrlich, Robert Martin

CPSO#: 15189

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1955

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Markham Stouffville Hospital P O Box 1800 281 Church Street Markham ON L3P 7P3
Date Received: 20 Apr 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 14 Nov 1961 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1955
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016