skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 27/05/2019 7:30:45 AM

Baird, Ronald James

CPSO#: 15080

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1954

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 28 Dec 1959 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery Effective: 01 Dec 1965 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Apr 1955
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2009