skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 17/07/2019 4:57:45 AM

Lucke, Hans Hermann

CPSO#: 14896

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1994
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Date of Death: 21-Nov-2003

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, German

Education:Johann Wolfgang Goethe Univ at Frankfurt, 1936

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 01 Jan 1957 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 1954
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1994