skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 19/07/2019 7:43:46 PM

Bak, Zonko

CPSO#: 14783

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Nov 2000
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 03 Nov 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Ukrainian

Education:University of Toronto, 1954

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 14 Nov 1960 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 1954
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 20 Sep 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Nov 2000