skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 17/08/2019 10:49:41 PM

Kandel, Stefan

CPSO#: 14482

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 Nov 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 04 Nov 2011

Summary

Date of Death: 22-Feb-2013

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, German, Hungarian, Italian, Spanish

Education:University of Bucharest, 1944

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1972 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 1953
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Nov 2011