skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 21/08/2019 12:57:58 AM

Moe, Woon Jan Au

CPSO#: 14427

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 14 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 14 Jul 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Lingnan University, 1941

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 1953
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Jun 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 1995
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 14 Jul 2011