skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 19/08/2019 4:39:07 PM

Wigle, Ernest Douglas

CPSO#: 14401

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 24 Aug 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 24 Aug 2011

Summary

Date of Death: 3-Jul-2013

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1953

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 1958 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 1953
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Aug 2011