skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 19/09/2019 9:20:52 PM

Bosch, Jan Willem

CPSO#: 14357

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1999
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Date of Death: 5-Mar-2014

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Danish, English, German

Education:State University of Leiden, 1946

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 1953
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 Sep 1992