skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 16/07/2019 5:07:42 PM

Wyllie, John Clifton

CPSO#: 13879

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 22 Jun 1984
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Queen's University, 1952

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 01 Jan 1957 RCPSC Specialist
General Pathology Effective: 01 Jan 1960 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 1952
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Dec 1960
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 1961
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Oct 1963
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Jun 1984