skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 21/08/2019 8:41:00 PM

Cosman, Henry Herbert

CPSO#: 13711

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1998
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 1998

Summary

Date of Death: 27-Aug-2014

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1949

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 1954 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jan 1952
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1998