skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 23/08/2019 9:26:34 AM

Morgan, Bruce Evan

CPSO#: 13437

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 29 Aug 1996
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 29 Aug 1996

Summary

Date of Death: 12-Feb-2007

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1951

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 25 Nov 1960 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1951
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Aug 1996