skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 21/08/2019 12:16:51 PM

Cameron, Howard Spencer

CPSO#: 13427

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 May 1996
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 31 May 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1950

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1955 RCPSC Specialist
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1957 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1951
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 May 1996