skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 19/09/2019 9:52:29 PM

Thompson, Murray Cornwall

CPSO#: 13274

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1993
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Date of Death: 21-Jul-2015

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1950

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 01 Jan 1956 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Oct 1950
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1993