skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 18/07/2019 9:21:49 AM

Grainger, Frank Alfred

CPSO#: 12890

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 13 Jun 1990
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Date of Death: 11-Apr-2005

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1943

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 01 Jan 1956 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 1949
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Sep 1959
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Nov 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Jun 1990