skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 18/06/2019 5:28:09 PM

Hutchison, Douglas Alexander

CPSO#: 12553

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1999
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Date of Death: 14-Apr-2007

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1947

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 May 1948
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1992