skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 16/06/2019 6:42:30 AM

Eagleson, William Mackinley

CPSO#: 12403

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 12 Jun 1996
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 12 Jun 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1947

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1953 RCPSC Specialist
Dermatology Effective: 01 Jan 1967 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 1947
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Jun 1996