skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 21/08/2019 11:46:43 AM

Kyle, Clarence Arthur

CPSO#: 11868

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1999
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Date of Death: 9-Dec-2003

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1939

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 1946
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 Jun 1990