skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 18/07/2019 1:43:39 PM

Thompson, Charles Alexander

CPSO#: 11848

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 Dec 1998
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 31 Dec 1998

Summary

Date of Death: 26-Aug-2004

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1938

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 01 Jan 1945 RCPSC Specialist
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1946 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Nov 1945
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Dec 1998