skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 19/09/2019 9:21:42 PM

Lynn, Ralph Beverley

CPSO#: 11749

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2004
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2004

Summary

Date of Death: 1-Dec-2006

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1945

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Thoracic Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1957 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 May 1945
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2004