skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 17/08/2019 10:50:26 PM

Robinson, Clarence Edward Armstrong

CPSO#: 11651

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 19 Aug 1985
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Queen's University, 1942

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 27 Nov 1954 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jan 1945
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Specified Certificate Effective: 16 Nov 1965
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Nov 1973
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Public Service Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Nov 1974
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Feb 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 1977
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Jan 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Aug 1985