skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 16/09/2019 10:43:43 PM

Smith, George Foster

CPSO#: 10928

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 27 Jul 1988
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Date of Death: 24-Sep-2004

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Toronto, 1936

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 01 Jan 1945 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Oct 1939
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 Jul 1988