skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 22/09/2019 7:15:55 PM

Vale, Bruce Winston

CPSO#: 10860

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1999
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Date of Death: 5-Nov-2002

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1938

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 1939
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1992