skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 18/07/2019 1:34:15 PM

Kemp, Charles Robert

CPSO#: 10802

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 05 Jun 2000
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 05 Jun 2000

Summary

Date of Death: 14-Jun-2009

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1938

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1972 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1939
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Jun 2000