skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 18/07/2019 1:24:35 PM

Baillie, James Hamilton

CPSO#: 10788

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1997
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Date of Death: 16-Oct-2004

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Toronto, 1938

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Public Health Effective: 01 Jan 1950 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1939
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Jun 1979