skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 19/07/2019 7:00:20 PM

Squires, Arthur Hunter

CPSO#: 10392

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 17 Aug 1999
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 19 Jul 1999

Summary

Date of Death: 27-Jun-2002

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1935

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1937
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Jul 1999