skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 23/08/2019 10:09:11 AM

Sage, Eduoard

CPSO#: 102460

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Paris, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 15 Dec 2013 to 08 Mar 2014
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 09 Mar 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Mar 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014