skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 25/08/2019 11:39:40 AM

White, Jennifer Patricia

CPSO#: 102251

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Oct 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Oct 2015

Summary

Former Name: Wilson, Jennifer Patricia (used until: 11 Nov 2015 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University College of Dublin, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
21 Essa Rd
Barrie ON  L4N 3K4
Phone: 705-739-8989
Fax: 705-739-8987 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: B. White Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 24 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. B. White ( CPSO# 100592)
Dr. J. White ( CPSO# 102251)

Business Address:
104 - 30 Martha Street
Bolton ON  L7E 5V1
Phone Number: (905) 951-1912

Business Address:
Unit 1-2
Massey Street
Angus ON  L0M 1B0
Phone Number: (249) 877-5414

Business Address:
21 Essa Road
Barrie ON  L4N 3K4
Phone Number: (705) 739-8989

Business Address:
1070 Innisfil Beach Road
Innisfil ON  L9S 4T9
Phone Number: (249) 877-5414

Business Address:
76 C Dunlop West
Barrie ON  L4N 1A5
Phone Number: (249) 877-5414

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Oct 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JENNIFER PATRICIA WHITE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WHITE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 22 Oct 2013 to 13 Jan 2014
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 14 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 20 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 21 Oct 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 19 Oct 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Oct 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Oct 2015