skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 26/06/2019 10:28:39 AM

Roshan, Tariq Mahmood

CPSO#: 101308

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 29 Jun 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 29 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Nishtar Medical College, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Pakistan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Hematological Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 23 Sep 2013
Assessment Verification Period - Hematological Pathology

University of Ottawa, 24 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Hematological Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Hematological Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Hematological Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematological Pathology

University of Ottawa, 07 May 2018 to 29 Jun 2018
Elective Trainee - Hematological Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 May 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Jun 2018