skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 20/06/2019 8:14:21 AM

Mohajer, Pouya

CPSO#: 101263

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Saint James School of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Phone: (905)683-2320 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

100-1333 Neilson Road
Scarborough ON  M1B 3C2
Canada
Phone: (416) 291-7719
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

7075 Rexwood Road
Mississauga ON  L4T 4M1
Canada
Phone: (905) 293-9663
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Canada
Phone: (905) 494-2120
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Mohajer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 21 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Mohajer ( CPSO# 101263)
Dr. H. Hamami ( CPSO# 113527)

Business Address:
Suite 100
1333 Neilson Road
Scarborough ON  M1B 3C2
Phone Number: (416) 291-7719

Business Address:
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Phone Number: (905) 683-2320

Business Address:
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Business Address:
77 Provost Drive
Toronto ON  M2K 0B7
Phone Number: (416) 901-7407

Business Address:
7075 Rexwood Road
Mississauga ON  L4T 4M1
Phone Number: (905) 293-9663

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 21 Oct 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. POUYA MOHAJER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOHAJER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 22 Sep 2013
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2015