skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 19/06/2019 11:20:55 PM

Roebbelen, Erica Lee

CPSO#: 101066

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Shelter Health Network
YWCA
75 MacNab Street South
Hamilton ON  L8P 3C1
Phone: (905) 5267137
Fax: 9055267969 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 204
200 James Street South
Hamilton ON  L8P 3A9
Canada
Phone: 905-526-1606
Fax: 905-526-7692
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Shelter Health Network
82 Stinson Street
Hamilton ON  L8N 1S2
Canada
Phone: 905-526-7137
Fax: 905-526-7969
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Wesley Street Health Clinic
195 Ferguson Ave. N.
Hamilton ON  L8L 8J1
Canada
Phone: 905-546-3606
Fax: 905-526-7969
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ERICA LEE ROEBBELEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROEBBELEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2015