skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 19/07/2019 12:24:04 AM

Wang, Xuan

CPSO#: 101060

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 13 Jun 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 13 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Queensland, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 1A
1383 16th avenue
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 0E2
Phone: (905) 918-3560
Fax: (905) 669-8646 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Wang Ngo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 02 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ngo ( CPSO# 95651 )
Dr. X. Wang ( CPSO# 101060)

Business Address:
1383 18th Avenue
Suite 1A
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 0E2
Phone Number: (905) 918-3560

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. XUAN WANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 22 Sep 2013
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 23 Sep 2013 to 04 May 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 05 May 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 04 May 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 05 May 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 02 May 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 May 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 2016