skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 20/06/2019 1:46:05 PM

Rolland, Sebastien

CPSO#: 100980

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Laval University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 10 May 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 27 Oct 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 02 Jul 2013 to 26 Jul 2013
Elective Trainee - Gastroenterology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Queen's University, 21 Nov 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 19 Nov 2017
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Jul 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2016
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018