skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 24/06/2019 3:34:49 PM

Alabdulaaly, Ibrahim Abdulrahman I

CPSO#: 100811

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Saud University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Jul 2013
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Trauma

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Trauma

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016