skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 19/07/2019 12:02:21 AM

Chaudhry, Sultan Rashid

CPSO#: 100722

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jun 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Josephs Hospital
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Rodgers Chaudhry Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 27 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Rodgers ( CPSO# 100558)
Dr. S. Chaudhry ( CPSO# 100722)

Business Address:
Niagara Health System
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Business Address:
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 845-2571

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Hospital
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SULTAN RASHID CHAUDHRY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAUDHRY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 13 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 14 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017