skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 19/06/2019 11:33:41 PM

Reaume, Samantha Christine

CPSO#: 100671

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 13 Apr 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 13 Apr 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
80 Maria St
Tavistock ON  N0B2R0
Phone: 519-655-2322
Fax: 519-655-3073 Electoral District: 02

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Stratford General Hospital Stratford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Apr 2017 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SAMANTHA CHRISTINE REAUME may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REAUME is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 21 Sep 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 22 Sep 2014 to 31 May 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jun 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 08 Apr 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 09 Apr 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 08 Apr 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Apr 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Apr 2017