skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 20/07/2019 7:37:56 AM

Wadhwa, Sonia

CPSO#: 100453

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 01 Jun 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Windsor University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC Victoria Hospital
Division of Child and Adolescent
Psychiatry
800 Commissioners Rd E
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Electoral District: 02

Additional Practice Location(s)

Stratford General Hospital
Special Services Unit
90 John St S
Stratford ON  N5A 1Y8
Canada
Phone: (519) 272-8186
County: County of Perth
Electoral District: 02

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 13 Jul 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SONIA WADHWA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WADHWA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 21 Oct 2013
Assessment Verification Period - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 22 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 13 Jul 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 14 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2017 to 13 Jul 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 14 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Child and Adolescent Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2018 to 13 Jul 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Child and Adolescent Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 14 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 6 - Child and Adolescent Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2019