skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 20/06/2019 7:29:42 AM

Rockman, Rebecca Frances

CPSO#: 100426

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Aug 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 01 Aug 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6000 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 301
491 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5N 1A7
Canada
Phone: 4168487665
Fax: 4168487664
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: David Gurau Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 30 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Gurau ( CPSO# 96268 )
Dr. R. Rockman ( CPSO# 100426)

Business Address:
3210 Harvester Road
Burlington ON  L7N 3T1
Phone Number: (905) 634-4440

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 27 Jul 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. REBECCA FRANCES ROCKMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROCKMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 May 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 27 Jul 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Jul 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2018