skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 19/06/2019 9:58:29 AM

Dmetrichuk, Jennifer Michelle

CPSO#: 100345

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 06 Jun 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Aberdeen, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
McMaster University
Room MDCL - 3101A
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: 905 525 9140 Ext. 22183 Electoral District: 04

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



United Kingdom

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JENNIFER MICHELLE DMETRICHUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DMETRICHUK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 23 Sep 2013
Assessment Verification Period - General Pathology

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 6 - Forensic Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jun 2019