skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 20/06/2019 12:14:34 AM

Holland, Craig William

CPSO#: 100171

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Michigan State University (Osteopathic), 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Nelson Medical Professional Group, 301 Victoria Avenue, Fort Frances, ON P9A 2C1
Date Received: 19 May 2016


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Michigan

USA - Minnesota

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 May 2013
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 May 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 14 Nov 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Aug 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Jan 2015
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 16 Jan 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016