skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 20/04/2019 5:05:18 PM

Perron, Thomas Michael

CPSO#: 99973

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 25 Mar 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 25 Mar 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 25 Mar 2013 to 07 Apr 2013
Elective Trainee - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 09 Feb 2016 to 22 Feb 2016
Elective Trainee - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Feb 2016 to 25 Mar 2016
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Mar 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Apr 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Feb 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Mar 2016