skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 23/07/2019 4:02:40 PM

Laratta, Cheryl Roberta

CPSO#: 99962

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 03 Apr 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 03 Apr 2016

Summary

Former Name: Lane, Cheryl Roberta (used until: 17 Feb 2016 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 31 Oct 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 12 Mar 2013 to 08 Apr 2013
Elective Trainee - Respirology

University of Ottawa, 07 Mar 2016 to 03 Apr 2016
Elective Trainee - Respirology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Mar 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Apr 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Mar 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Apr 2016