skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 25/06/2019 5:51:50 PM

Glynn, Aaron Anthony John

CPSO#: 99897

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 31 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University College of Dublin, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 19 Feb 2013 to 20 Mar 2013
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 21 Mar 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Jul 2013
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 19 Feb 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Mar 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2013